07/13/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 69, Statutes of 2023. | |||
07/13/2023 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
07/03/2023 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 06/22/2023 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1681.). | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 13). | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1412.) | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2023 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 24). | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2023 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2023 | Read first time. To print. |