Assembly | 02/01/2024 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2024 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2023 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2023 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 26). | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2023 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2023 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2023 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2023 | Read first time. To print. |