|
09/22/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 354, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
From committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 25)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dodd.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2023
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1466.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 22. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|