Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dodd.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2023
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2137.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 22. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|