California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1778 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2024

Amended

Bill May 30, 2024
Bill April 18, 2024
Bill April 1, 2024
Bill March 6, 2024