California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1792 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 08/31/2024

                            Enrolled  August 31, 2024 Passed IN  Senate  August 28, 2024 Passed IN  Assembly  May 21, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1792Introduced by Assembly Member RodriguezJanuary 04, 2024 An act to amend Section 1797.103 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to emergency medical services.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1792, Rodriguez. Emergency medical services: personal protective equipment.Existing law requires the Emergency Medical Services Authority to develop planning and implementation guidelines that address designated components for emergency medical services systems.This bill would require the authority to develop standards, on or before January 1, 2027, for personal protective equipment for ambulance personnel and to update the standards on or before January 1, 2032, and every 5 years thereafter.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 1797.103 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read:1797.103. (a) The authority shall develop planning and implementation guidelines for emergency medical services systems which address the following components:(1) Manpower and training.(2) Communications.(3) Transportation.(4) Assessment of hospitals and critical care centers.(5) System organization and management.(6) Data collection and evaluation.(7) Public information and education.(8) Disaster response.(b) The authority shall, on or before January 1, 2027, develop standards for personal protective equipment (PPE) for ambulance personnel. The authority shall update the standards on or before January 1, 2032, and every five years thereafter.

 Enrolled  August 31, 2024 Passed IN  Senate  August 28, 2024 Passed IN  Assembly  May 21, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1792Introduced by Assembly Member RodriguezJanuary 04, 2024 An act to amend Section 1797.103 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to emergency medical services.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1792, Rodriguez. Emergency medical services: personal protective equipment.Existing law requires the Emergency Medical Services Authority to develop planning and implementation guidelines that address designated components for emergency medical services systems.This bill would require the authority to develop standards, on or before January 1, 2027, for personal protective equipment for ambulance personnel and to update the standards on or before January 1, 2032, and every 5 years thereafter.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  August 31, 2024 Passed IN  Senate  August 28, 2024 Passed IN  Assembly  May 21, 2024

Enrolled  August 31, 2024
Passed IN  Senate  August 28, 2024
Passed IN  Assembly  May 21, 2024

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION

 Assembly Bill 

No. 1792

Introduced by Assembly Member RodriguezJanuary 04, 2024

Introduced by Assembly Member Rodriguez
January 04, 2024

 An act to amend Section 1797.103 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to emergency medical services.

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AB 1792, Rodriguez. Emergency medical services: personal protective equipment.

Existing law requires the Emergency Medical Services Authority to develop planning and implementation guidelines that address designated components for emergency medical services systems.This bill would require the authority to develop standards, on or before January 1, 2027, for personal protective equipment for ambulance personnel and to update the standards on or before January 1, 2032, and every 5 years thereafter.

Existing law requires the Emergency Medical Services Authority to develop planning and implementation guidelines that address designated components for emergency medical services systems.

This bill would require the authority to develop standards, on or before January 1, 2027, for personal protective equipment for ambulance personnel and to update the standards on or before January 1, 2032, and every 5 years thereafter.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 1797.103 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read:1797.103. (a) The authority shall develop planning and implementation guidelines for emergency medical services systems which address the following components:(1) Manpower and training.(2) Communications.(3) Transportation.(4) Assessment of hospitals and critical care centers.(5) System organization and management.(6) Data collection and evaluation.(7) Public information and education.(8) Disaster response.(b) The authority shall, on or before January 1, 2027, develop standards for personal protective equipment (PPE) for ambulance personnel. The authority shall update the standards on or before January 1, 2032, and every five years thereafter.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 1797.103 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read:1797.103. (a) The authority shall develop planning and implementation guidelines for emergency medical services systems which address the following components:(1) Manpower and training.(2) Communications.(3) Transportation.(4) Assessment of hospitals and critical care centers.(5) System organization and management.(6) Data collection and evaluation.(7) Public information and education.(8) Disaster response.(b) The authority shall, on or before January 1, 2027, develop standards for personal protective equipment (PPE) for ambulance personnel. The authority shall update the standards on or before January 1, 2032, and every five years thereafter.

SECTION 1. Section 1797.103 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read:

### SECTION 1.

1797.103. (a) The authority shall develop planning and implementation guidelines for emergency medical services systems which address the following components:(1) Manpower and training.(2) Communications.(3) Transportation.(4) Assessment of hospitals and critical care centers.(5) System organization and management.(6) Data collection and evaluation.(7) Public information and education.(8) Disaster response.(b) The authority shall, on or before January 1, 2027, develop standards for personal protective equipment (PPE) for ambulance personnel. The authority shall update the standards on or before January 1, 2032, and every five years thereafter.

1797.103. (a) The authority shall develop planning and implementation guidelines for emergency medical services systems which address the following components:(1) Manpower and training.(2) Communications.(3) Transportation.(4) Assessment of hospitals and critical care centers.(5) System organization and management.(6) Data collection and evaluation.(7) Public information and education.(8) Disaster response.(b) The authority shall, on or before January 1, 2027, develop standards for personal protective equipment (PPE) for ambulance personnel. The authority shall update the standards on or before January 1, 2032, and every five years thereafter.

1797.103. (a) The authority shall develop planning and implementation guidelines for emergency medical services systems which address the following components:(1) Manpower and training.(2) Communications.(3) Transportation.(4) Assessment of hospitals and critical care centers.(5) System organization and management.(6) Data collection and evaluation.(7) Public information and education.(8) Disaster response.(b) The authority shall, on or before January 1, 2027, develop standards for personal protective equipment (PPE) for ambulance personnel. The authority shall update the standards on or before January 1, 2032, and every five years thereafter.



1797.103. (a) The authority shall develop planning and implementation guidelines for emergency medical services systems which address the following components:

(1) Manpower and training.

(2) Communications.

(3) Transportation.

(4) Assessment of hospitals and critical care centers.

(5) System organization and management.

(6) Data collection and evaluation.

(7) Public information and education.

(8) Disaster response.

(b) The authority shall, on or before January 1, 2027, develop standards for personal protective equipment (PPE) for ambulance personnel. The authority shall update the standards on or before January 1, 2032, and every five years thereafter.