Assembly | 05/16/2024 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2024 | (Ayes 51. Noes 13. Page 4259.) | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2024 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (February 27). | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2024 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 01/09/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 8. | ||
Assembly | 01/08/2024 | Read first time. To print. |