Assembly | 05/16/2024 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2024 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2024 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 9). | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2024 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2024 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 01/10/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. | ||
Assembly | 01/09/2024 | Read first time. To print. |