Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB S., JUD. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 5311.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2024
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/29/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (February 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/10/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|