California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1818 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2024

Amended

Bill July 3, 2024
Bill June 24, 2024
Bill May 16, 2024
Bill April 18, 2024