California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1824 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2024

Amended

Bill August 22, 2024
Bill March 19, 2024