California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1830 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2024

Amended

Bill August 14, 2024
Bill June 17, 2024
Bill May 23, 2024
Bill May 21, 2024
Bill May 8, 2024
Bill March 20, 2024