Assembly | 05/16/2024 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 01/29/2024 | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 16. | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2024 | Read first time. To print. |