Senate | 06/11/2024 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2024 | Referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2024 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4661.) | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 3). | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 16. | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2024 | Read first time. To print. |