Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5395.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/17/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|