|
08/26/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 196, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5295.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2024
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/17/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|