California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1864 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2024

Amended

Bill August 15, 2024
Bill August 5, 2024
Bill June 26, 2024
Bill June 20, 2024
Bill May 16, 2024
Bill April 1, 2024
Bill March 6, 2024