California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1871 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2024

Amended

Bill August 22, 2024
Bill April 1, 2024