Senate | 07/03/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2024 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2024 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 5157.) | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2024 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 1). | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2024 | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD. | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 22. | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2024 | Read first time. To print. |