California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1877 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2024

Amended

Bill August 23, 2024
Bill August 15, 2024
Bill March 19, 2024