|
03/25/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 5, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3385.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2024
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4394.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2024
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 4393.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2024
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4393.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2024
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4369.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2024
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|