|
09/22/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 362, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2024
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2024
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2024
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|