California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1901 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2024

Amended

Bill June 20, 2024
Bill May 29, 2024