09/25/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 555, Statutes of 2024. | |||
09/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
08/27/2024 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 08/20/2024 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/20/2024 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 8.). | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (May 28). | ||
Senate | 05/01/2024 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2024 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4534.) | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2024 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 19). | ||
Assembly | 01/24/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 23. | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2024 | Read first time. To print. |