|
07/15/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 91, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5883.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4489.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4399.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/25/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/24/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|