|
09/25/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 556, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5356.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/25/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|