Assembly | 05/24/2024 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2024 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2024 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 01/26/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 25. | ||
Assembly | 01/25/2024 | Read first time. To print. |