|
09/28/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 816, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2024
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5087.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2024
|
Referred to Com. on E.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|