|
08/26/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 198, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 6236.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4628.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E. D. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and B., P. & E. D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4660.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2024
|
Referred to Com. on A., E., S., & T.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 1.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|