Assembly | 05/16/2024 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2024 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 2). | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2024 | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2024 | Read first time. To print. |