Senate | 06/25/2024 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | Referred to Coms. on PUB S. and APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2024 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 1. Page 5641.) | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2024 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2024 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 9). | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2024 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2024 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2024 | Read first time. To print. |