Assembly | 05/16/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2024 | Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 5174.) | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2024 | (Pending re-refer to Com. on APPR.) | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2024 | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 5139.) | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2024 | Re-referred to Coms. on U. & E. and APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2024 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2024 | Referred to Com. on U. & E. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2024 | Introduced measure version corrected. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2024 | Read first time. To print. |