Assembly | 05/16/2024 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2024 | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and HUM. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 2. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2024 | Read first time. To print. |