|
07/18/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 147, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
07/18/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/18/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 6159.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L., P.E. & R. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2024
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|