|
09/22/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 370, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 8.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 4.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 9. Page 5314.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2024
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|