|
07/15/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 98, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2024
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4626.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4630.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2024
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|