Assembly | 05/16/2024 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2024 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2024 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2024 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/02/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2024 | Read first time. To print. |