|
09/22/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 372, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2024
|
Enrolled measure version corrected.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2024
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2024
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 5.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2024
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4989.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ELECTIONS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2024
|
Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|