Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5412.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|