|
09/22/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 373, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2024
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 8.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2024
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|