|
07/15/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 99, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2024
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4624.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 5157.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|