Assembly | 05/16/2024 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5215.) | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2024 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2024 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 2). | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2024 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/02/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2024 | Read first time. To print. |