Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 10. Page 5564.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2024
|
Referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|