Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB S. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 7. Page 5359.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|