Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5215.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2024
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (April 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|