Assembly | 05/22/2024 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Cervantes. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2024 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 17). | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2024 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2024 | Read first time. To print. |