California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2096 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 5, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2024

Amended

Bill June 24, 2024
Bill May 16, 2024