California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2106 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 5, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2024

Amended

Bill August 15, 2024
Bill July 3, 2024
Bill May 16, 2024
Bill April 23, 2024
Bill March 21, 2024