|
09/19/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 270, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2024
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|