|
09/22/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 378, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2024
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 9.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 7.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2024
|
Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|